+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in General Laws by voice vote
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
- Reconsidered by GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101950D
+ − Vote
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor