+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 748 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB788ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB788H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107122D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107122D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104616D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Lamont Bagby
Type:
Primary Sponsor