+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 084626564-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB788E
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation (May)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084626564
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2008: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N)
February 21, 2008: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor