+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 32-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 7-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Reported from Education (13-Y 9-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102127D