+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB786H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105700D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105700D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101855D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2018: Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor