+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 599 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB786ER)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB786H1
- Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 065212316-H1
- Committee amendments from Finance rejected
- Read second time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 065212316-H1
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources (Hamilton)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #3 (Ware, R.L.)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067911316
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 8, 2006: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor