+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
On March 31, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB786ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Justice
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 961462837