+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 199 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB785ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103530D