+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 283 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB784ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14101273D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB784E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101273D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor