+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB783ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute on Labor and Commerce agreed to 20106358D-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB783EH1
- Committee amendment on Appropriations agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 20106358D-EH1
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101850D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Alex Q. Askew
Type:
Primary Sponsor