+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0452)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 452 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/16
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB782ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101286D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor