+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 18106038D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100913D
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor