+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
- Reconsidered by Transportation Innovations and General Topics Subcommittee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Referred from Finance by voice vote
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105102D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
David A. Reid
Type:
Primary Sponsor