+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
On April 9, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB778ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (83-Y 13-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD3478112 (HB778S1)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (62-Y 35-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed LD3128112 (HB778E)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from L. & C. with amendment (13-Y 5-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to L. & C. sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from L. & C. with amendment (13-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor