+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0341)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 341 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB776ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100481D
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor