+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 961025351-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 961025351