+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 703 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB775ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (75-Y 19-N)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (30-Y 8-N)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 19-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 19-N)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 19-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB775H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105159D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Finance by voice vote
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred from Appropriations by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 16105159D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 3-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103561D