+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 1/1/15)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB771ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105153D-S1 (91-Y 6-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB771S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105153D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105153D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102085D
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 5-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2014: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor