+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
- Enacted, Chapter 840 (effective 7/1/10)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB770ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N)
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 10106246D-H2
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB770ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104933D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB770H1
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104933D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101603D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
March 10, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor