+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 532 (effective 4/4/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB77ER)
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB77S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 069237712-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 069237712-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 061684114-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB77E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On December 16, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/06 061684114
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor