+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB77ER)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/16/03 042058132