+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB769ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB769ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
- Senate sub. w/amd. agreed to by House (93-Y 2-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 987622144-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Lambert agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amd. 987622144-ES1
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 987622144-S1
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 981568492-EH1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd. 981568492-EH1
- Amendment by Mr. Callahan agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 981568492-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 981568492-H1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (24-Y 1-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 987203743
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 2, 1998: Reported from General Laws with sub. (24-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor