+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On December 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 21-N)
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 21-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Speaker ruled Amendments by Delegate Simon not germane
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 3-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100430D