+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB768ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 18108104D-H2
- Conference report agreed to by House (64-Y 29-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 29-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
- Conference report agreed to by House (65-Y 29-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (65-Y 29-N 1-A)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 5-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107427D-S1 (1-Y 97-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N 1-A)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Wagner, Norment, Saslaw
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Jones, S.C., Habeeb, Filler-Corn
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107427D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB768S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 12-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107427D-S1
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 15-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 15-N 1-A)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105565D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB768H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105565D-H1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102993D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (14)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (65-Y 29-N 1-A)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 29-N 1-A)
February 28, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 5-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N 1-A)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 12-N)
February 26, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 15-N 1-A)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor