+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 10, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 365 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB765ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105602D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB765S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105602D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105602D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10103937D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB765E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103937D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor