+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 366 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB764ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to General Laws and Technology
- Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12103548D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB764E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Education by voice vote
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103548D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor