+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Krizek, Leftwich, Robinson
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Bell, Reeves, McPike
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE:Rejected (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 22106694D-S1 (1-Y 97-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 1-N 3-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB764S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106694D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106694D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (73-Y 27-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 27-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB764H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105632D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105632D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100550D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2022: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 24, 2022: VOTE:Rejected (1-Y 97-N)
February 21, 2022: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 1-N 3-A)
February 18, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 27-N)
February 3, 2022: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
February 1, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor