+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
On March 31, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 413 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB762ER)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 961978809