+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108878D-S1 (64-Y 32-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108878D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes Yes
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB761S1
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 19-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 32-N)
- House acceded to request
- Delegates: VanValkenburg, Simon, Price
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Deeds, Petersen, McDougle
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Senate amendment #1 from Finance and Appropriations rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (24-Y 15-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 40-N)
- Senate floor amendment by Senate Petersen agreed to by House (58-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20108878D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N)
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 40-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB761H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106652D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
- Reported from Appropriations (10-Y 8-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20106652D-H1
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102058D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (14)
March 5, 2020: Senate insisted on amendment (24-Y 15-N)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 40-N)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 32-N)
March 5, 2020: Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
March 5, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 19-N)
March 4, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N)
February 3, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (10-Y 8-N)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
January 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Schuyler T. VanValkenburg
Type:
Primary Sponsor