+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 277 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB760ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB760H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104758D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104758D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103223D
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor