+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 133 (effective - see bill)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB759ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB759H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105062D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105062D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103306D