+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective - see bill)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB759ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Rust, Jones, Howell, A.T.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Puller, Martin, Petersen
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senators Puller and Martin agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104901D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB759H1
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104901D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103085D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 8, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2014: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
February 21, 2014: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor