+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 79 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB758ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14102733D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB758E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102733D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor