+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 298 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB755ER)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 047126340-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB755E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (17-Y 5-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047126340