+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0301)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 301 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB754ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Courts of Justice
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Defeated by Senate (6-Y 34-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101972D
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 2018: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
February 14, 2018: Defeated by Senate (6-Y 34-N)
February 14, 2018: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor