+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 339 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB753ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N)
- Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB753H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106542D-H1
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20106542D-H1
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with amendment (17-Y 5-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101223D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2020: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
January 20, 2020: Reported from Education with amendment (17-Y 5-N)
January 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Sam Rasoul
Type:
Primary Sponsor