+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 18, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 495 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB752ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 8-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N)
- Reconsidered by Local Government
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in L. G. (5-Y 10-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N)
- Read third time and passed House (63-Y 34-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 002933772-E
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (65-Y 28-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended (65-Y 28-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (12-Y 8-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 002933772
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 8-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N)
February 22, 2000: Failed to report (defeated) in L. G. (5-Y 10-N)
February 12, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (65-Y 28-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (12-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor