+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 577 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB751ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105227D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB751S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105227D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105227D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101496D