+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 320 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB750ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 005041428