+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB749ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101431D
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2014: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor