+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 2, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 801 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB747ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 5-N)
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
- Substitute by Del. Cantor agreed to 008209664-H1
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. 008209664-H1
- Floor substitute printed 008209664-H1 (Cantor)
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (23-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 000303216
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
January 31, 2000: Reported from General Laws (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor