+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/04)
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB743ER)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB743H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 042997516-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 042997516-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub (21-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 042070516
+ − Votes (7)
February 5, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2004: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2004: Reported from Finance with sub (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor