+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Stricken from docket by Local Government by voice vote
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 967016410-H1
- Amendment by Ms. Puller agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd. 967016410-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 967016410-EH1
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 967016410-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 960047410
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1996: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor