+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB742ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 6-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 5-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Defeated by House (65-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
- Amendment by Ms Drake agreed to (50-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N)
- Amendment by MS. Drake reconsidered (53-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (53-Y 46-N)
- Motion to pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Ms Drake rejected second vote (44-Y 54-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (44-Y 54-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Passed by temporarily (91-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: TO PASS BY TEMPORARILY (91-Y 6-N)
- Passed House (92-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (92-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 7-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983736480
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice