+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0426)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 426 (effective 7/1/16)
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB742ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105602D-S1 (92-Y 6-N)
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB742S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105602D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105602D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (18-Y 4-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100076D
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
February 24, 2016: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2016: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
February 1, 2016: Reported from Finance (18-Y 4-N)
February 1, 2016: Reported from Finance (18-Y 4-N)
January 27, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor