+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (16-Y 1-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S. Rule20(j),rereferred by G.L. (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 43-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Clement agreed to
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 45-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Griffith agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended (50-Y 45-N)
- Printed as engrossed 981510450-E
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 981510450
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (16-Y 1-N)
February 25, 1998: Pursuant to S. Rule20(j),rereferred by G.L. (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 43-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 45-N)
February 9, 1998: Reported from Education with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor