+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB738ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 26-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (17-Y 9-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 988944396
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Tra. (17-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor