+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Deeds, Surovell, Obenshain
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Bell, Adams, L.R., Herring
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB736H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105951D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105951D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100839D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2022: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2022: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N)
March 2, 2022: Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N)
March 1, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
February 15, 2022: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
February 11, 2022: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N)
February 9, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor