+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
On April 7, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB735ER)
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 028029636-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 028029636-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 028029636-H1
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 023516636