+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB735ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100763D